judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAWN A. PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0556
Short Caption:SHAWN A. PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL3656-04Filed Date:04/19/2011

Opening Event Date:04/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShawn A. Phillips YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 19, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
05/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 45 days (Served by: DCCA on 7/1/11).
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the lodged appellant's brief and limited appendix are filed and directing appellee's brief within 30 days from the date of this order
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix to Appellant's Brief.
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/21/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
10/06/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance (Titled Reply Brief) (Appellant)(Served by: DCCA on 10/6/11).
01/12/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/12/2012FiledAffirmed
02/03/2012FiledMandate