judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GLEN SVANES, AN EMPLOYEE OF G & L ENTERPRISES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0176)
Case Number:S-10-0176Case Docketed On:08/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GLEN SVANES, AN EMPLOYEE OF G & L ENTERPRISES v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GLEN SVANES, AN EMPLOYEE OF G & L ENTERPRISES, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGlen SvanesDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/12/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/24/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/30/2010Motion - ReinstatementMotionReinstatement of caseFinal
09/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for reinstatement of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2010Order - Denying petition for reinstatement of appealOrderDenyFinal
09/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal