judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIELS (JONATHAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35002
Short Caption:DANIELS (JONATHAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45257
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126201Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/06/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10275
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11153
03/06/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 15. Mailed on 03/02/00. 00-03466
03/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-05453
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05477
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. 02-05477