judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CAROLYN MIMS BOHN v. WILFORD J. BOHN

Case: B-4251
B-4251
10/09/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CAROLYN MIMS BOHN
WILFORD J. BOHN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/03/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/21/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/01/1974Letter Filed
02/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/03/1973Reply to Response
11/21/1973Response to Petition
11/20/1973Miscellaneous Motion
10/23/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/09/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carolyn Mims BohnPetitioner
Wilford J. BohnRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information