judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KERRY SHEA PRICE V. WASH. METRO. AREA TRANSIT AUTH., ETAL

Case Information: 11-CV-0567
Short Caption:KERRY SHEA PRICE V. WASH. METRO. AREA TRANSIT AUTH., ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9208-09Filed Date:05/04/2011

Opening Event Date:05/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKerry Shea PriceYPro SeN
AppelleeWashington Metropolitan Area Transit AuthorityN
Carol B. O'KeeffeNN
Gerard J. StiefYN
AppelleeAmalgamated Transit Union Local 689N
Douglas TaylorYN
AppelleeWarren George N
Douglas TaylorYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on May 4, 2011, and it ap pearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/25/2011RECORD COPIES
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/15/2011LETTER - from aplt putting opposing counsel on notice of part of the record that aplt intends on refenence to
06/24/2011LETTER - from aplt re: rule 30 Statement Of Issues *(to determine if the trial court abused its discretion on 4/19/10) (elp)
06/30/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/30/2011APPENDIX
06/30/2011LETTER- from aplt re: filing of 6/24/11 noting the correct appeal no. 11-CV-567
07/05/2011LETTER- from aplt re: written correspondence from aple
08/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)Granted
08/08/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Amalgamated Transit Union Local 689, Appellee George)
08/24/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)
08/24/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/2011FiledBrief (mexb still pend). (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)
08/24/2011FiledSupplemental Appendix (mexb still pend). (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)
09/02/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledReply Brief w/apendix (Appellant) (Price v. Union)
09/12/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 8/24/11, mailed to appellant and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and remailed to appellant to the most current address on record that includes Apartment No. 301. elp (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/09/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)
12/09/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) w/ documents attachedDenied
12/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee Amalgamated Transit Union Local 689)
01/11/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte holding the motion for leave to file supplemental pleading in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignment
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/17/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to file supplemental pleading to brief.
02/22/2012FiledMotion for enlargement of time (Construed as requesting more time to argue case) (Appellant)Denied
02/23/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion for enlargment of time (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)Construed as requesting more time to argue case)
03/01/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for enlargement of time.
03/22/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Thompson, Schwelb
04/12/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.
04/20/2012FiledMotion to amend opinion (Appellee Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority)Granted
04/26/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/22/2012FiledOrder Granting aple WMATA's petition to amend opinion.
05/24/2012FiledAffirmed (AMENDED OPINION) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed.
08/23/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/02/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)