judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOYKO, OLGA WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA

Case Information: 81-CV-0997
Short Caption:BOYKO, OLGA WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4068-78Filed Date:07/23/1981

Opening Event Date:07/23/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/24/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/21/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jack H. OlenderNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John C. Swanson NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOYKO, OLGA WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
07/23/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/24/1982FiledRecord Completed
06/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/21/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition