judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WOHLFARTH, DONALD E. TART, NELSON M.

Case Information: 81-CV-1469
Short Caption:WOHLFARTH, DONALD E. TART, NELSON M.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/04/1981

Opening Event Date:12/04/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/20/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/31/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/02/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WOHLFARTH, DONALD E. TART, NELSON M.
12/04/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1982FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1982FiledBriefing Completed
11/02/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition