judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. v. RETHA C. GUNTER, personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES

Case Heading (S-07-0076)
Parent: 06-205 Case Docketed On:04/05/2007
Consolidated:S-07-0076
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. v. RETHA C. GUNTER, personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES
Full Title:In the Matter of the Estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES, Deceased: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC., Appellant (Intervenor), v. RETHA C. GUNTER, personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHalliburton Energy Services, Inc.James Corey Worthen
Roger E. Shumate
AppelleeRetha C. GunterKent W. Spence
Mary Kristeen Hand

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 151
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/05/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/05/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Attachment to notice of appeal (received)Notice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
05/21/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
07/05/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/05/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary - see case note.MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/10/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Kite recusedNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/13/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/20/2007Brief - Appellant reply. Appellant's combined response to appellee's motion to dismiss and reply brief. This is an improper combined pleading, see entry below.BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/20/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Appellant's combined response to appellee's motion to dismiss and reply brief. This is an improper combined pleading, see above entry.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/23/2007Order - Consolidating cases for purposes of opinion.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docket (S-07-0076 only, oral argument already held in 06-205)OrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/26/2007Order - Assignment of Judge Dan R. Price II to act in this matter and recusing Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original Papers. Record for direct appealRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order declining to answer certified question and affirming district court judgment. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/15/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal