judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES EBNER, GERALD

Case Information: 80-CM-0165
Short Caption:UNITED STATES EBNER, GERALDClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Unlawful Entry
Lead: 80-CM-0115 Consolidated:80-CM-0165
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M12487-79Filed Date:02/11/1980

Opening Event Date:02/11/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/09/1980
Argued/Submitted:02/22/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES EBNER, GERALD ET AL.
02/11/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/22/1980FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1980FiledBriefing Completed
02/22/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition