judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO EAGLE

Case Information: 33717
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO EAGLECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CV9803046Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00821
03/02/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 2/25/99). 99-01455
03/17/1999MotionFiled Motion. Consent to Withdrawal as Attorney of Record (called for certificate of service). 99-01938
03/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Mailing. 99-02181
04/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We elect to treat the document filed on March 17, 1999, as a motion by counsel to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant. We deny the motion. Attorney Gary D. Fairman, Esq. Shall remain listed as counsel of record for appellant. Counsel for appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). 99-02480
04/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time. 99-03031
04/22/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have to and including May 3, 1999, to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) by filing either a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. 99-03163
05/03/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 11/10/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Tonya Lemich. 99-03485
06/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 11/10/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Tonja D. Lemich. 99-04986
07/06/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-05892
08/13/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). 99-07557
08/16/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 8/13/99. 99-07574
08/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-07575
09/07/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 9/7/99. 99-08394
09/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-08395
09/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Supplement Respondent's Appendix. 99-08475
09/15/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The proposed supplement, provisionally submitted with the motion, shall be filed forthwith. 99-08689
09/15/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplement to Appendix to Respondent's Answering Brief. 99-08476
11/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-10869
11/08/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-11014
11/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. "We hereby dismiss this appeal." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-11230
11/15/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.