judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00566-CR
01-89-00566-CR
06/08/1989
Misdemeanor
Nwudu, Onyemaechi Martins
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/06/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/20/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
01/05/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/21/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1989Submitted
10/25/1989Submission
10/25/1989Submitted
09/06/1989Submission
06/08/1989Case ready to be set
06/08/1989Transcript filed
06/08/1989Case ready to be set
06/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/07/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantCharles Rick Young
StateCriminal - State of TexasGilbert Douglas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 12
Harris
4219
$750.00