Case: 06-96-00116-CR
06-96-00116-CR
11/25/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Holcomb, Kenneth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/24/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/01/1997 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
09/10/1997 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | WRIT REFUSED | |
08/15/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/07/1997 | LETTER | | |
08/04/1997 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/14/1997 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
06/20/1997 | Motion to Extend Time for Filing PDR | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/13/1997 | Mot ext time Sup SFACTS Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/13/1997 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/12/1997 | Submitted | | |
05/12/1997 | Submission | | |
05/05/1997 | Mot Ext time file Sup SFACTS | | |
04/23/1997 | No Description Available. | | |
04/23/1997 | Holding for Record | | |
04/08/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
04/08/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/27/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
02/10/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/03/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/09/1997 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
01/02/1997 | Transcript Filed | | |
11/25/1996 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/25/1996 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/24/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kenneth Holcomb | Appellant | Hon. James E. Burnett Mr. Kenneth Wayne Holcomb |
Trial Court Information
276th District Court
Marion
Honorable William R. Porter
11202
60 yrs TDCJ