judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAUSHIVA, BRAHMA S. LOCAL 2142

Case Information: 81-CV-1110
Short Caption:KAUSHIVA, BRAHMA S. LOCAL 2142Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:81-CV-1110Consolidated: 82-CV-0527
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5792-77Filed Date:08/20/1981

Opening Event Date:08/20/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/23/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/01/1982
Argued/Submitted:06/29/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrahma S. Kaushiva NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KAUSHIVA, BRAHMA S. LOCAL 2142 ET AL
08/20/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/23/1981FiledRecord Completed
04/01/1982FiledBriefing Completed
06/29/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/11/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition