judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY, INC., a Delaware Corporation v. ENCANA OIL AND GAS (USA) INC., a Delaware Corporation,

Case Heading (S-13-0151)
Case Number:S-13-0151Case Docketed On:07/11/2013
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY, INC., a Delaware Corporation v. ENCANA OIL AND GAS (USA) INC., a Delaware Corporation,
Full Title:BLACK DIAMOND ENERGY, INC., a Delaware Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ENCANA OIL AND GAS (USA) INC., a Delaware Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBlack Diamond Energy, Inc.Greg L. Goddard
J. David Jorgenson
AppelleeEncana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.Darin Boyd Scheer
Erin Kelly Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Evidence, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2014 WY 64
Citation:326 P.3d 904 (Wyo. 2014)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/11/2013Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/11/2013Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/11/2013Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/11/2013Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/11/2013Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice to Counsel (Darin B. Scheer) regarding mandatory e-filing requirements and service of ordersNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
07/22/2013Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
07/24/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. David Jorgenson; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/24/2013Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Order Granting Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice - J. David Jorgenson for AppellantOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
08/23/2013Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/26/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief in ChiefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/10/2013Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/11/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2013Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/29/2013Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/30/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/31/2013Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/05/2013Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, fifteen volumes. Volumes I-XIII, Original Papers - Volumes III & V were not designated or transmitted; Volume XIV, Transcripts; Volume XV, Exhibits - three large binders.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/05/2013Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/06/2013Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk re transmission of recordCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/12/2013Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from J. David Jorgenson obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/11/2013Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke and Davis (Greg L. Goddard, J. David Jorgenson, argument by Mr. Jorgenson obo Appellant; Erin K. Murphy, Darin Boyd Scheer, argument by Mr. Scheer obo Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/20/2014Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/04/2014Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
06/05/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Application for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2014Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
06/17/2014Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/17/2014Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/17/2014Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/17/2014Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/23/2014Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 6/19/14ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal