judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOWLER, NORMA J.

Case Information: 81-CV-1050
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOWLER, NORMA J.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12887-79Filed Date:07/16/1981

Opening Event Date:07/16/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/12/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/22/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Judith Rogers NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles A. Brady NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOWLER, NORMA J.
07/16/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1983FiledRecord Completed
09/20/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/22/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/23/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition