Case Information: 33698 | |||
Short Caption: | MILKO VS. MAO-MILKO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D199771 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D227706 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/31/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
02/03/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/03/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00738 | |
02/03/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 99-00739 | |
02/03/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/16/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from H.M. Milko--Smith's Money Order #05842224. | ||
03/15/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. We defer ruling on the proper person motion we received on February 24, 1999. | 99-01813 | |
03/31/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Mailed on: 3/29/99. | 99-02403 | |
03/31/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/11/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99A-RR/CY/MS | 99-05001 | |
07/07/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. | 99-05965 | |
07/07/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 1999. | 99-05965 |