judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KINO RAMA BEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-13-0123)
Case Number:S-13-0123Case Docketed On:06/03/2013
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KINO RAMA BEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KINO RAMA BEMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKino Rama Beman Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingDavid L. Delicath
Jeffrey Scott Pope
Peter K. Michael

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2013 WY 147
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/03/2013Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/03/2013Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/03/2013Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/19/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/22/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2013Order - Granting Extension of Time to File BriefOrderGrantFinal
09/05/2013Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
09/05/2013Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/05/2013Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/06/2013Record - Received unfiled record, four volumes.RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
09/06/2013Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief; and received proposed orders.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2013Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdrawOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
11/13/2013Failure to File - Brief of appellant (Anders)Failure to FileBrief of appellantFinal
11/27/2013Opinion - Published Order Affirming the District Court's Judgment and SentenceOpinionPublished orderFinal
12/13/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/13/2013Record - Returned unfiled record to District Court ClerkRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
12/18/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - Unfiled record signed for 12/16/2013.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/18/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal