judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0838-89
PD-0838-89
06/09/1989
PDR Case Type
BALLARD, BILLY WAYNE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/23/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
06/23/1989RESPONSE FILED
06/09/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
BALLARD, BILLY WAYNEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John D. Nation
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00260-CR
Aff 3-24-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
283rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable JACK HAMPTON
F87-80320-ST