Case: WR-15,232-02
WR-15,232-02
06/09/1989
1107-HC
WILSON, MELVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/30/1989 | ACTION TAKEN | HC relief denied WITHOUT written order. | |
06/09/1989 | WRIT RECEIVED | | |
10/20/1988 | 3RD DELAYED WRIT L | | |
06/21/1988 | 2ND DELAYED WRIT L | | |
03/01/1988 | D/W ORDER LETTER | | |
12/09/1987 | DELAYED WRIT LTR | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/30/1989 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Melvin | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
265th District Court
Dallas
W79-8283-R(B)