judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0829-89
PD-0829-89
06/09/1989
PDR Case Type
OKRA, DONNY EDWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/1990FINAL DISPRefused
03/14/1990PDR DISPRefused
07/11/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/09/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/06/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Okra, Donny EdwardApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Donny Edward Okra
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-86-00607-CR
Aff 3-29-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
292nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable MICHAEL KEASLER
F85-91617-V