judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-19,581-01
WR-19,581-01
06/09/1989
1107-HC
VISER, KEVIN BENARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/26/1989ACTION TAKENHC relief denied WITHOUT written order.
06/09/1989WRIT RECEIVED
05/30/1989MISC DOCUMENT RECD
02/28/1989MOT/EXT OF TIME RE
12/07/1988MOT/EXT OF TIME RE
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/26/1989STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
VISER, KEVIN BENARDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
407365-A