Case Information: 17-FM-1363 | |||
Short Caption: | KIM WATERS V. ROGER BELL | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO5353-17 | Filed Date: | 12/04/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/04/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 01/26/2018 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 05/23/2018 |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Kim Waters | N | Pro Se | N | |
Appellee | Roger Bell | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/04/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
12/19/2017 | Filed | Order - directing statement that identifies order on appeal | ||
01/02/2018 | Filed | Response to Court's Order Dated December 19, 2017 (Appellant) | ||
01/04/2018 | Filed | Initial Order - directing statement regarding transcript | ||
01/17/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
01/17/2018 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
01/19/2018 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
01/26/2018 | Filed | No Transcript Needed per SRT | ||
01/26/2018 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/31/2018 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
03/22/2018 | Filed | Order - directing motion, brief & appendix (Appellant) | ||
05/01/2018 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
05/01/2018 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
05/23/2018 | Filed | Mandate |