judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL and THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY

Case Heading (S-12-0003)
Parent: S-12-0002 Case Docketed On:01/04/2012
Consolidated:S-12-0003
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL and THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY
Full Title:YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL, Appellee (Cross-Petitioner) and THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantYates Petroleum CorporationMatthew Joy
Eric Lynn Hiser
AppellantMarathon Oil CompanyMatthew Joy
Eric Lynn Hiser
AppelleeWyoming Outdoor CouncilSteve Jones
AppelleeDepartment of Environmental QualityGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Christopher M. Brown
Michael Barrash

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/04/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/04/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company, Appellants Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/29/2012Event - Phone Call Event - Phone Call from Deputy AG re caption on S-12-0003 and why State not a party to appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
03/08/2012Motion - Unopposed Motion to Add the Department of Environmental Quality as a Cross-AppelleeMotionOtherFinal
03/21/2012Order - Granting Unopposed Motion to Add the Department of Environmental Quality as an Appellee in Case S-12-0003 and Order Consolidating Appeals.OrderGrantFinal
04/06/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief by Appellee The Wyoming Department of Environmental QualityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Responsive Brief of Appellee Wyoming Outdoor CouncilEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company in Reply to Wyoming Department of Environmental Quality's Response BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellants Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company in Reply to Wyoming Outdoor Council's Response in Docket 12-0003EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jay A. Jerde obo DEQNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Steve Jones obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Matthew Joy obo Yates PetroleumNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record. (Record received approximately May 10, 2012 and was inadvertently placed on shelf without filing)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/21/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument presented. Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite and Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Michael Barrash, Senior Assistant Attorney General, for Wyoming Department of Environmental Quality; Matthew Joy for Yates Petroleum and Marathon Oil; Steve Jones for Wyoming Outdoor Council; and Jay Jerde, Deputy Attorney General for Intervenor Wyoming Department of Environment Quality in S-12-0003) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal