judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY and YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL

Case Heading (S-12-0002)
Parent:S-12-0002Case Docketed On:01/04/2012
Consolidated: S-12-0003
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY and YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL
Full Title:THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, Appellant (Respondent), and YATES PETROLEUM CORPORATION AND MARATHON OIL COMPANY, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING OUTDOOR COUNCIL, Appellee (Cross-Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Environmental QualityGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Michael Barrash
Christopher M. Brown
AppellantYates Petroleum CorporationEric Lynn Hiser
Matthew Joy
AppellantMarathon Oil CompanyEric Lynn Hiser
Matthew Joy
AppelleeWyoming Outdoor CouncilSteve Jones

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 135
Citation:286 P.3d 1045

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/04/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/04/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2012Brief - Appellant (Yates and Marathon)BriefAppellantFinal
02/21/2012Brief - Appellant (State of Wyoming)BriefAppellantFinal
02/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant State of Wyoming; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company, AppellantsYates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/02/2012Motion - Amicus - leave to participate - Motion of the Petroleum Association of Wyoming for leave to participate as amicus curiae and to file its brief supporting appellants Yates and Marathon and in support of reversal of the district court; proposed brief; and proposed order.MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
03/21/2012Order - Amicus - deny participation - Order Denying Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae BriefOrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
04/09/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Responsive Brief of Appellee Wyoming Outdoor CouncilEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of Appellant The Wyoming Department of Environmental QualityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Yates Petroleum Corporation and Marathon Oil Company in Reply to Wyoming Outdoor Council's Response Brief in Docket 12-0002EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Michael Barrash obo DEQNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Steve Jones obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/31/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Matthew Joy obo Yates PetroleumNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record. (Record received approximately May 10, 2012 and was inadvertently placed on shelf without filing)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/21/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument presented. Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite and Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Michael Barrash, Senior Assistant Attorney General, for Wyoming Department of Environmental Quality; Matthew Joy for Yates Petroleum and Marathon Oil; Steve Jones for Wyoming Outdoor Council; and Jay Jerde, Deputy Attorney General for Intervenor Wyoming Department of Environment Quality in S-12-0003) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal