Case Information: 17-CF-1361 | |||
Short Caption: | KAVON S. GLOVER V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF3-1046-16 | Filed Date: | 12/02/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/02/2017 | Case Status: | Under Advisement |
Record Completed: | 03/07/2018 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/06/2019 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/13/2019 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | Ready to be Decided | |
Mandate Issued: | |||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Kavon S. Glover | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/02/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
12/13/2017 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
12/13/2017 | Filed | Appointing Counsel/CJA Regina Michaels, Esquire (Appellant) | ||
01/22/2018 | Filed | Order directing appellant to submit the statement regarding transcripts, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, w/n 15 days from the date of order. | ||
01/22/2018 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant) | Granted | |
02/09/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant) | ||
02/09/2018 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
02/28/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
02/28/2018 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
02/28/2018 | Filed | Supplemental #1 (REQUEST FOR REVOCATION/REMOVAL) | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (17 pages/White) 5/8/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (19 pages/White) 5/15/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (108 pages/Gardener) 5/15/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (79 pages/Rogers) 5/16/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (36 pages/Gardener) 5/16/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (240 pages/Gardener) 5/17/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #8 (241-375 pages/Gardener) 5/18/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #9 (79 pages/Clark) 5/22/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #10 (80-107 pages/Clark) 5/23/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #11 (108-157 pages/Clark) 5/24/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #12 (21 pages/tape) 11/3/17 proceeding | ||
03/07/2018 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
03/16/2018 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
07/31/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
08/07/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 9/28/18 | ||
10/01/2018 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/18/2018 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 1/7/19 | ||
01/07/2019 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
01/07/2019 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
02/06/2019 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
02/06/2019 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) | Granted | |
02/06/2019 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
02/08/2019 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) and the attached Government Exhibits and CD will be forwarded to the Director, Criminal Division for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. | ||
02/13/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #13 (22 pages/tape) 3/14/18 proceeding | ||
02/27/2019 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
03/08/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #14 (government's exhibit video's #1-17 (DVD) & government's exhibit #70, 71 & 100 - photographs) | ||
04/15/2019 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
07/31/2019 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/13/2019 | Filed | Submitted to Associate Judge Glickman, Associate Judge Beckwith, and Senior Judge Washington |