judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TODD L. ROMSA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-12-0005)
Case Number:S-12-0005Case Docketed On:01/06/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:TODD L. ROMSA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:TODD L. ROMSA, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTodd L. RomsaR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Michael Thomas Kahler
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2012 WY 146
Citation:288 P.3d 695

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Todd L. RomsaEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Wyoming Department of Transporation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/01/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 12/7/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal