judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE VS. LANQUIST

Case Information: 38511
Short Caption:MOORE VS. LANQUISTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364793Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Maupin, ShearingCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Senior Justice ShearingPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/03/2001 / Holland Johnson, SusanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd.--check no. 034734.
09/21/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15996
10/02/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Susan Holland Johnson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/09/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16929
10/11/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Susan Holland Johnson.
11/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-19588
12/05/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-20321
12/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-21512
02/13/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Kravitz Schnitzer & Sloane, Chtd.
02/19/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/15/02. Signed by: M. Bradley Johnson. Called for Table of Authorities, Due date: 10 days. 02-03151
02/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-03152
02/22/2002Other Other. Received Table of Cases for Opening Brief. Inserted into brief behind Table of Contents.
03/21/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 29, 2002. 02-05055
04/01/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/28/02. Signed by: George E. Carter. 02-05784
04/01/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Index to Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. 02-05786
04/15/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 04/11/02. Signed by: M. Bradley Johnson. 02-06690
09/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-15844
09/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
11/08/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing.
02/04/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-DA/ML/NB 03-01883
03/04/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-02073
03/04/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/17/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 6, 2003. 03-02073