judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD J. BOUCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0045)
Case Number:S-12-0045Case Docketed On:03/07/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DONALD J. BOUCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD J. BOUCHER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald J. BoucherDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Sara Carty
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 145
Citation:288 P.3d 427 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of ClientEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/11/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/22/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/25/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/05/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/11/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/10/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal