judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BIG-D SIGNATURE CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation v. STERRETT PROPERTIES, LLC, 3 CREEK RANCHES, LLC, Utah Limited Liability Companies, and MORRIS R. STERRETT, an individual

Case Heading (S-12-0046)
Case Number:S-12-0046Case Docketed On:03/08/2012
Linked To: S-12-0047
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BIG-D SIGNATURE CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation v. STERRETT PROPERTIES, LLC, 3 CREEK RANCHES, LLC, Utah Limited Liability Companies, and MORRIS R. STERRETT, an individual
Full Title:BIG-D SIGNATURE CORPORATION, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STERRETT PROPERTIES, LLC, 3 CREEK RANCHES, LLC, Utah Limited Liability Companies, and MORRIS R. STERRETT, an individual, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBig-D Signature CorporationDavid F. DeFazio
Sarah Ellen Tollison
AppelleeSterrett Properties, LLCAndrea L. Richard
Appellee3 Creek Ranches, LLCAndrea L. Richard
AppelleeMorris R. SterrettAndrea L. Richard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 138
Citation:288 P.3d 72

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/08/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/08/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
03/08/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/08/2012Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
03/19/2012Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/25/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/26/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Big-D Signature Corporation; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/15/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Big-D Signature Corporation; received copy of brief of cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Errata to Reply BriefNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Errata for Reply Brief of Appellent Big-D Signature Corporation.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2012Order - Assignment of judge Dan R. Price II, District Judge to act in this matter and Recusing Justice GoldenOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David F. DeFazio and Sarah E. Tollison obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/26/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Andrea Richard obo Sterrett PropertiesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/21/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt and Burke and District Judge Price (Sarah Tollison and David F. DeFazio for Appellant in S-12-0046 and Andrea L. Richard for Appellee in S-12-0046) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, District Judge Price writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 11/20/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal