Case: 13-94-00418-CV
13-94-00418-CV
09/01/1994
Personal Injuries/Damages
Brown, Patricia J.
Hopkins, Sidney W.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/09/2000 | Document Received | | |
03/08/2000 | Exhibits Checked Out | | |
06/28/1996 | Cite for opinions | | |
04/17/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/29/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/12/1995 | Submitted | | |
10/12/1995 | Submission | | |
09/28/1995 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/26/1995 | Submission | | |
09/19/1995 | Motion to Reset submission | | |
09/01/1995 | Submission | | |
01/03/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
01/03/1995 | Oral argument requested | | |
12/06/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/06/1994 | Oral argument requested | | |
12/06/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1994 | Exhibits Filed | | |
11/07/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
11/07/1994 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
09/15/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/07/1994 | Statement Filed | | |
09/01/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
09/01/1994 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
09/01/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
09/01/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
09/01/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/17/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brown, Patricia J. | Appellant | Hon. Kevin W. Grillo Hon. Robert C. Hilliard |
Hopkins, Sidney W. | Appellee | Hon. Vaughan Waters Hon. Mary A. Goldsmith Roland L. Leon |
Trial Court Information
148th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Wells Stewart
91-4753-E