Case Information: 19-CF-0511 | |||
Short Caption: | SAEVE EDWARD EVANS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF1-20268-16 | Filed Date: | 06/13/2019 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/13/2019 | Case Status: | In Briefing |
Record Completed: | 10/18/2019 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | Appendix | |
Mandate Issued: | |||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Saeve E. Evans | Y |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/13/2019 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
06/20/2019 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
07/17/2019 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
09/03/2019 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
09/06/2019 | Filed | Record Index | ||
09/06/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (Complaint, Entry of appearance, Pretrial Service Report Notice)) Sealed | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #2 (52 pages/Walker) 1/5/17 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #3 (35 pages/White) 10/25/17 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #4 (58 pages/Rogers) 1/11/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #5 (94 pages/Richer) 1/17/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #6 (95-182 pages/Richer) 1/18/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #7 (170 pages/Armstrong) 1/22/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #8 (171-450 pages/Armstrong) 1/23/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #9 (451-713 pages/Armstrong) 1/24/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #10 (714-957 pages/Armstrong) 1/28/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #11 (958-1152 pages/Armstrong) 1/29/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #12 (1153-1418 pages/Armstrong) 1/30/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #13 (1419-1624 pages/Armstrong) 1/31/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #14 (1625-1875 pages/Armstrong) 2/4/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #15 (1876-2101 pages/Armstrong) 2/5/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #16 (2102-2354 pages/Armstrong) 2/6/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #17 (2355-2492 pages/Armstrong) 2/7/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #18 (37 pages/Hunt) 2/8/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #19 (37 pages/Johnson) 5/3/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Supplemental Record - #20 (19 pages/Lindsay) 5/17/19 proceeding | ||
10/18/2019 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
10/22/2019 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
11/21/2019 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
11/25/2019 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant to March 2, 2020. | ||
02/28/2020 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
03/11/2020 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to 5/31/20. | ||
06/09/2020 | Filed | Order that the appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix on or before June 30, 2020. | ||
06/29/2020 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/16/2020 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) to September 28, 2020. | ||
09/24/2020 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
09/30/2020 | Filed | Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix to 12/27/20.(Appellant) | ||
12/21/2020 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix (Appellant) | Granted | |
12/23/2020 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief, Appendix to March 19, 2021. |