judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKY D. MILLER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-12-0033)
Case Number:S-12-0033Case Docketed On:02/24/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:RICKY D. MILLER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:RICKY D. MILLER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRicky D. MillerCole N. Sherard
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Travis J. Kirchhefer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2012 WY 115
Citation:283 P.3d 1153

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/24/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/24/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/24/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
04/06/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Ricky D. Miller; Statement of Cost of Original Transcript; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/24/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/24/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/12/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/18/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/18/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/18/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/24/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/21/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal