judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STACEY NELSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-12-0032)
Case Number:S-12-0032Case Docketed On:02/23/2012
Linked To: S-12-0031 , S-12-0073
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:STACEY NELSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:STACEY NELSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStacey NelsonR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Michael Thomas Kahler
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2012 WY 160
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/23/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/03/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Stacey NelsonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2012Correspondence - IncomingCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - submission of additional authority pursuant to W.R.A.P. 7.04.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/11/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/03/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/19/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/04/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/04/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/7/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal