judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: MICHAEL A. KAPLAN

Case Information: 11-BG-0636
Short Caption:IN RE: MICHAEL A. KAPLANClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN144-11Filed Date:05/27/2011

Opening Event Date:05/27/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
PetitionerBar CounselN
William R. RossNY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
RespondentMichael A. Kaplan NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/27/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey imposing a stayed one-year suspension on responden and placing him on brobation for a period of one year. Mr. Kaplan was administrativelly suspended by the DC Bar for failure to pay his dues and his failure to file the required annual registration statements, and remain suspended.
06/14/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending the one-year suspension of respondent and placing him on probation for one year, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the pratice of law in the District of Columbia for one-year with the suspensiion stayed in favor of probation for one-year with the conditions imposed in New Jersey. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. (ETW)
07/28/2011FiledStatement regarding reciprocal discipline (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
09/29/2011FiledTMC/ NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE/ OTSC/ STATEMENT OF BAR COUNSEL/ RESPONDENT TEIR's RESPONSE/ RESPONDENT MARTIN's RESPONSE/ PROPOSED ORDER/
10/06/2011FiledSuspended - IRDERED that respondent is hereby suspended for a period of one year, all stayed in favor of a one-year probationary period subject to the conditions imposed in New Jersey. (OB,ST,KG)