judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD PAUL HUTCHINSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0034)
Case Number:S-12-0034Case Docketed On:02/27/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONALD PAUL HUTCHINSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD PAUL HUTCHINSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Paul HutchinsonElisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
Theodore R. Racines
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 155
Citation:290 P.3d 174

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/27/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearanceNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/23/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/26/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas obo Appellant and Appellant's First Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/29/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Secton Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/30/2012Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/02/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/20/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/21/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/27/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/27/2012Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
09/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Pope obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/25/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Hill, Voigt, Burke, and Davis (Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas for Appellant; Jeffrey Scott Pope for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/13/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/02/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/02/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/02/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/02/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/08/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/4/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal