judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN W. OSBORN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0042)
Parent:S-12-0042Case Docketed On:03/05/2012
Consolidated: S-12-0116
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:KEVIN W. OSBORN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVIN W. OSBORN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin W. Osborn Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 159
Citation:290 P.3d 1096

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/05/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/05/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/22/2012Motion - Appointment of counselMotionAppointment of counselFinal
04/02/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/02/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/03/2012Order - Denying Motion for Appointment of CounselOrderDenyFinal
05/10/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Amended index from the Clerk of the District CourtNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/05/2012Order - Consolidating cases (Brief filed S-12-0042 considered in this appeal as well)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/10/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/23/2012Motion - Appointment of counsel, Appellant's Second RequestMotionAppointment of counselFinal
07/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/06/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/07/2012Order - Denying Second Motion for Appointment of CounselOrderDenyFinal
08/20/2012Correspondence - Incoming from Appellant, he will not be filing a Reply Brief, wishes cases to move forwardCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/17/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/02/2013Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
01/15/2013Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/15/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/15/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/18/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 1/17/2013ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal