judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIS A. CENTER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0211)
Case Number:S-10-0211Case Docketed On:10/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Wyoming Rules of Criminal Procedure
Short Title:WILLIS A. CENTER, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIS A. CENTER, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWillis A. Center Sr.Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Shannon Katherine McDonald
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 73
Citation:252 P.3d 963

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order to Proceed In Forma PauperisRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
10/11/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/15/2010Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant regarding status of case.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/15/2010Correspondence - Outgoing - responded to status inquiry.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
11/22/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/06/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief - reply brief of appellant. Filed pro se.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Diane E. Courselle for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/06/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief - reply brief of appellant filed by Diane Courselle, counsel.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of time - reply brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and Entry of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/13/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/20/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Letter from appellant inquiring about the expedited order and time to file reply brief.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/20/2010Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to Mr. Center re filing of reply brief.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
01/10/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/06/2011Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docketMotionOral argument - reassignment from brief only docketFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Hear Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2011Event - Phone Call to Defender Aid Clinic, left message; received Consent of Client, advised that this pleading must be e-filed. (Heading contains improper District Court title). Also requested self-addressed stamped envelope for return of service copies.EventPhone CallFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Shannon McDonald, student intern, to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - consent of client.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Consent of Client for Shannon K. McDonald to appear on behalf of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client Duplicate copies of Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/22/2011Order - Denying Motion for Assignment to Oral Argument DocketOrderDenyFinal
04/27/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, remand with directions, Justice Hill writing for the Court. Justice Voigt filed a dissent in which Justice Burke joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/06/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order amending sentence filed 5/2/2011 in District Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/17/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/16/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal