judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUCE L. EGAN v. ALEX LEHNEN

Case Heading (S-12-0026)
Case Number:S-12-0026Case Docketed On:02/21/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:BRUCE L. EGAN v. ALEX LEHNEN
Full Title:BRUCE L. EGAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ALEX LEHNEN, Appellee (Defendant)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBruce L. Egan Pro Se
AppelleeAlex LehnenEdward Frank Hess

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/21/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/21/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/06/2012Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
03/08/2012Event - Phone Call from Appellant re dismissal.EventPhone CallFinal
03/12/2012Petition - Reinstatement of appealPetitionReinstatementFinal
03/27/2012Order - Denying Petition for ReinstatementOrderDenyFinal
03/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal