judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6843
A-6843
05/05/1958
Application for Writ of Error
J. A. WARD, ET AL.
W. L. MARTIN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/28/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/18/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/12/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/20/1958Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/15/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
05/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/28/1958Motion for RehearingDenied
06/18/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/12/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/20/1958Response to Petition
05/15/1958Response to Petition
05/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/05/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
05/05/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. L. Martin, et al.Respondent
J. A. Ward, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information