judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN H. HIBSMAN, JR., Deceased: JASON HIBSMAN v. ROBERT "BOB" MULLEN and TRUDY HIBSMAN, REBECCA HIBSMAN and EMILY HIBSMAN

Case Heading (S-12-0036)
Case Number:S-12-0036Case Docketed On:03/01/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN H. HIBSMAN, JR., Deceased: JASON HIBSMAN v. ROBERT "BOB" MULLEN and TRUDY HIBSMAN, REBECCA HIBSMAN and EMILY HIBSMAN
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN H. HIBSMAN, JR., Deceased: JASON HIBSMAN, Appellant (Former Personal Representative), v. ROBERT "BOB" MULLEN, Appellee (Personal Representative), and TRUDY HIBSMAN, REBECCA HIBSMAN and EMILY HIBSMAN, Appellees (Heirs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason Todd HibsmanGreg Weisz
Jodi D. Shea
AppelleeRobert MullenRobert Mullen
AppelleeRebecca Hibsman Pro Se
AppelleeEmily Hibsman Pro Se
AppelleeTrudy Hibsman Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Estates - Probate
Opinion Number:2012 WY 139
Citation:287 P.3d 757

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/01/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/01/2012Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant to clarify parties to appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/16/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/31/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee (Personal Representative)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/05/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellees - HibsmanBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
06/15/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/25/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/13/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from M. Gregory Weisz and Jodi D. Shea obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert "Bob" Mullen obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt, and Burke (Jodi Dreher Shea and Michael (Greg) G. Weisz, argument by Mr. Weisz for Appellant and Robert "Bob" Mullen for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing appeal. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal