judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER BOURNE V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 11-AA-0630
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER BOURNE V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DPWK190794-10Filed Date:05/26/2011

Opening Event Date:05/26/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChristopher Bourne NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/26/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
05/26/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
05/31/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim (OAG) and Holly Kirk (OAH)
06/20/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
06/20/2011TMC - OTSC
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File response Opposition/Reply/Answer (Petitioner)Granted
08/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave and CLERK SHALL FILE LODGED RESPONSE
08/01/2011FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause (Petitioner)
08/01/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
08/01/2011FiledDismissed
08/24/2011FiledMandate