judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT SHEPARD and LANA SHEPARD v. COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, WILLIS OF WYOMING, INC., formerly Ed Murray and Sons

Case Heading (S-12-0029)
Case Number:S-12-0029Case Docketed On:02/23/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:ROBERT SHEPARD and LANA SHEPARD v. COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, WILLIS OF WYOMING, INC., formerly Ed Murray and Sons
Full Title:ROBERT SHEPARD and LANA SHEPARD, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, WILLIS OF WYOMING, INC., formerly Ed Murray and Sons, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert ShepardFrank J. Jones
AppellantLana ShepardFrank J. Jones
AppelleeColorado Casualty Insurance CompanyJohn Anthony Coppede
Richard D. Bush
AppelleeWillis of Wyoming, Inc.Bradley Trent Cave
Isaac Nathan Sutphin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/23/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/23/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time in which to file Appellant's brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/04/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Second Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Appellants' Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/10/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (third request)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Third (and last) motion for extension of time in which to file Appellant's Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2012Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/11/2012Response/Objection - ExtensionResponse/ObjectionExtensionFinal
05/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Willis of Wyoming, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Appellants' Third (and Last) Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Extension of Time for the Filing of Appellees' Response Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/17/2012Order - Denying Appellees' Request for Extension to File BriefOrderDenyFinal
06/01/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
06/01/2012Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
06/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal