judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY J. SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0041)
Case Number:S-12-0041Case Docketed On:03/02/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:TIMOTHY J. SMITH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY J. SMITH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy J. SmithDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments
Opinion Number:2012 WY 130
Citation:286 P.3d 429

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/18/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/11/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/20/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/22/2012Correspondence - Incoming from District Court Clerk that record has been sentCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/25/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/25/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal