judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL BAESSLER, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF CAROL ANN MUNKBERG, Deceased; and KAREN R. SCHMID, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF JOHN ALLAN MUNKBERG, Deceased v. DOUG FREIER and DENNY FREIER, husband and wife, individually and d/b/a STOCKMAN'S BAR and the SMOKEHOUSE SALOON, Wyoming Partnerships in Fact

Case Heading (S-10-0212)
Case Number:S-10-0212Case Docketed On:10/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:PAUL BAESSLER, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF CAROL ANN MUNKBERG, Deceased; and KAREN R. SCHMID, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF JOHN ALLAN MUNKBERG, Deceased v. DOUG FREIER and DENNY FREIER, husband and wife, individually and d/b/a STOCKMAN'S BAR and the SMOKEHOUSE SALOON, Wyoming Partnerships in Fact
Full Title:PAUL BAESSLER, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF CAROL ANN MUNKBERG, Deceased; and KAREN R. SCHMID, as personal representative for the ESTATE OF JOHN ALLAN MUNKBERG, Deceased, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DOUG FREIER and DENNY FREIER, husband and wife, individually and d/b/a STOCKMAN'S BAR and the SMOKEHOUSE SALOON, Wyoming Partnerships in Fact, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul BaesslerWilliam L. Simpson
Larry B. Jones
Patrick J. Crank
AppellantKaren R. SchmidPatrick J. Crank
William L. Simpson
Larry B. Jones
AppelleeDoug FreierRyan Patrick Healy
AppelleeDenny FreierRyan Patrick Healy
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Negligence, Statutes
Opinion Number:2011 WY 125
Citation:258 P.3d 720

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
10/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of compliance with Rule 1.12 Wyoming Rules of Professional ConductEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/22/2010Motion - Other - Motion to appear and be heard for the limited purpose of defending the constitutionality of a state statute.MotionOtherFinal
11/16/2010Order - Granting Attorney General's Motion to Appear and be Heard for the Purpose of Defending Constitutionality of State StatuteOrderGrantFinal
11/18/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
11/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants and Statement of Costs - Rule 10.01 W.R.A.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Brief - Intervenor (Brief of Attorney General in his Official Capacity addressing Appellant's Constitutional Issues).BriefIntervenorFinal
01/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Attorney General of the State of Wyoming in His Official Capacity Addressing Appellants' Constitutional IssuesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2011Service - Amended Certificate of ServiceServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
01/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certificate of ServiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jay A. Jerde for Attorney General.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry B. Jones for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/21/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan P. Healy for appellees Freier.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Larry B. Jones and Patrick Crank, argument by Mr. Jones for appellants; Ryan P. Healy for appellees; Jay Jerde, Deputy Attorney General for Attorney General) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/26/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Chief Justice Kite filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Hill joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal