judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH ALLAN TYNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0210)
Case Number:S-10-0210Case Docketed On:10/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KEITH ALLAN TYNER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH ALLAN TYNER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith Allen TynerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 60
Citation:252 P.3d 935

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Documents; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/12/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/29/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal