judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINA CAROLE MAYCOCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0208)
Case Number:S-10-0208Case Docketed On:09/30/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CHRISTINA CAROLE MAYCOCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTINA CAROLE MAYCOCK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristina Carole MaycockKevin King Kessner
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 104
Citation:257 P.3d 20

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/30/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/30/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/17/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
11/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant Christina Maycock; appellant's statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kevin Kessner for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/18/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Christina MaycockEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kevin King Kessner for appellant; Justice A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/06/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/27/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card from Clerk of District Court, record received.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal