judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN A. DELOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-12-0044)
Case Number:S-12-0044Case Docketed On:03/07/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:STEVEN A. DELOGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN A. DELOGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven A. DeLoge Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Jeffrey Scott Pope

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 128
Citation:289 P.3d 776

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/05/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/21/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of certification regarding designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/23/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/11/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/11/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/21/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal