judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

UINTA COUNTY, WYOMING; UINTA COUNTY SHERIFF LOUIS NAPOLI; and BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF UINTA v. JUDEE PENNINGTON

Case Heading (S-12-0020)
Case Number:S-12-0020Case Docketed On:02/02/2012
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:UINTA COUNTY, WYOMING; UINTA COUNTY SHERIFF LOUIS NAPOLI; and BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF UINTA v. JUDEE PENNINGTON
Full Title:UINTA COUNTY, WYOMING; UINTA COUNTY SHERIFF LOUIS NAPOLI; and BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF UINTA, Appellants (Defendants), v. JUDEE PENNINGTON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThe Board of County Commissioners of Uinta County, WyomingRichard Rideout
AppellantUinta County Sheriff's OfficeGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Misha Westby
AppelleeJudee PenningtonV. Anthony Vehar
Melvin C. Orchard III

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Immunity
Opinion Number:2012 WY 129
Citation:286 P.3d 138

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2012Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2012Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Kite is recused from participation in this caseNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
03/19/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2012Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Melvin C. Orchard, III obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Misha Westby obo Appellant NapoliNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Richard Rideout obo Appellant CountyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/21/2012Order - Assignment of judge and Order Rescinding AssignmentOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/22/2012Brief - Petitioner reply (Appellants')BriefPetitioner replyFinal
05/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke and District Judge David Park (Misha Westby, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Richard Rideout, argument by Ms. Westby for Appellants; V. Anthony Vehar for Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/01/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing. Judge Park writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/17/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/17/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/19/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal