judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6866
A-6866
05/21/1958
Application for Writ of Error
W. C. HENGER, DBA HENGER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
MAUDE RHODY COTTON, ET AL., BAKER HOTEL OF DALLAS, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/15/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/01/1958Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/07/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
06/05/1958Response to PetitionRespondent
05/21/1958Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/03/1958Order from Lower Court filed
10/23/1958Response to Motion filed
10/15/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1958Opinion issued
07/01/1958Reply to Response
06/12/1958Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
06/07/1958Response to Petition
06/05/1958Response to Petition
05/21/1958Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/21/1958Document received (See Remarks)
05/21/1958Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maude Rhody Cotton, et al.Respondent
W. C. Henger, dba Henger Construction CompanyPetitioner
Baker Hotel of Dallas, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information