judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BENJAMIN L. WYNN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1285
Short Caption:BENJAMIN L. WYNN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2973-79Filed Date:10/24/1980

Opening Event Date:10/24/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1982
Argued/Submitted:03/03/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBenjamin L. Wynn N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WYNN, BENJAMIN L. UNITED STATES
10/24/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/14/1981FiledRecord Completed
01/06/1982FiledBriefing Completed
03/03/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/19/1982FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition